Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Giuseppe Maria Serci Serra

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1827Born
8 Dec 184922.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 187144.8AppointedBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
4 Feb 187245.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ogliastra, Italy
25 Sep 188255.6AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
16 Jan 189365.9AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Sep 190073.6DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giuseppe Maria Serci Serra (VIAF: 307403073)
Archbishop Paolo Giuseppe Maria Serci Serra (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuramini, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116, and Page 171
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1872, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017