Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Gregorio Berchialla, O.M.V. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1825Born
18 Dec 184722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of the Virgin Mary
4 Aug 188156.2AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
14 Aug 188156.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
13 Oct 189267.4DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Gregorio Berchialla (VIAF: 88679471)
Archbishop Vincenzo Gregorio Berchialla O.M.V. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontelupo Albese
Ordained BishopSS. Trinità al Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017