Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Spinucci

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
6 Jan 166144.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 166851.3AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
21 May 166851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
7 Dec 169578.9DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Spinucci
Bishop Giuseppe Spinucci (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermo

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast