Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomino Benedetti

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1436AppointedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
6 Sep 1443AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
21 Oct 1454AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
1456¹DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomino Benedetti
Bishop Giacomino Benedetti (died 1456) Bishop of Penne e Atri

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213, and Page 260
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast