Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria de Rossi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1641BornBari
23 Jul 169654.9AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
25 Jul 169654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
10 Jun 169856.8DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria de Rossi:
Bishop Vincenzo Maria de Rossi O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013