Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felino Sandei

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1495AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
25 Sep 1495AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lucca, Italy
1499²SucceededBishop of Lucca, Italy
1502¹ResignedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
6 Sep 1503DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felino Sandei
Bishop Felino Sandei (died ) Bishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 214, and Page 180
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1495, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast