Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Pensa, O.Ss.C.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1869Born
19 May 189424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Saints Ambrose and Charles
27 Aug 191242.7AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
8 Sep 191242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
16 Dec 194879.0DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Pensa
Bishop Carlo Pensa O.Ss.C.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsino Inferiore
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 60
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast