Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Gentili

Deceased

Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1759³BornSanta Sophia
29 Jun 179839.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 181556.5AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
10 Sep 181556.5Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
1833¹73.8DiedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Stanislao Gentili:
Bishop Giuseppe Stanislao Gentili (born ) Bishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 156
  • b/c2+: CB, 2 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013