Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico Guarini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1772BornBoardi
12 Mar 179623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Mar 181845.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
24 Mar 181845.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
4 May 182855.4SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
23 Jun 182855.6ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
Sep 1837³64.7DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Guarini:
Bishop Federico Guarini O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 289, and Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013