Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Cordiviola

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1774³BornCatania
22 Sep 179722.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 182045.7SelectedBishop of Albenga, Italy
2 Oct 182046.0ConfirmedBishop of Albenga, Italy
8 Oct 182046.0Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
29 Aug 182752.9DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Cordiviola:
Bishop Carmelo Cordiviola (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013