Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Luigi Scarabelli, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1755BornCastelnuovo-Scrivia
24 Jun 182064.7SelectedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
2 Oct 182064.9ConfirmedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
17 Dec 182065.1Ordained BishopBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
26 Apr 183680.5ResignedBishop of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
26 May 184387.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Luigi Scarabelli
Bishop Pietro Luigi Scarabelli C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luni, Sarzana e Brugnato

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016