Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Triggiani, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1767BornBari
13 Nov 179124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Oct 181850.9SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
21 Dec 181851.1ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
27 Dec 181851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
27 Dec 182861.1ResignedBishop of Oria, Italy
10 Jul 182961.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Triggiani
Bishop Francesco Saverio Triggiani O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oria

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016