Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Antonio Montiglia

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1750BornPolistina
20 Mar 181867.6SelectedBishop of Squillace, Italy
25 May 181867.8ConfirmedBishop of Squillace, Italy
31 May 181867.8Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
9 Aug 182474.0SelectedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
27 Sep 182474.2ConfirmedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy
30 Nov 182676.3DiedBishop of Nicotera e Tropea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Antonio Montiglia
Bishop Nicola Antonio Montiglia (born , died ) Bishop of Nicotera e Tropea

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 284, and Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016