Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislao Lucchesi

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1755BornRoma
19 Dec 177823.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181863.4AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
4 Oct 181863.4Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
2 Nov 183075.5DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stanislao Lucchesi
Bishop Stanislao Lucchesi (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016