Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Borghi

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1759Born
22 Dec 178122.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181859.5AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
4 Oct 181859.5Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
8 Jun 183475.2DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Borghi
Bishop Antonio Maria Borghi (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorette

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast