Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Leonardo Brandaglia

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1774BornFirenze
16 Feb 179924.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 181540.8AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
26 Mar 181540.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
7 Aug 182551.2DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Martino Leonardo Brandaglia:
Bishop Martino Leonardo Brandaglia (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013