Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaudenzio Giovanni Antonio Patrignani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1755BornCoriano
19 Dec 177823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 May 181862.8AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
7 Jun 181862.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
15 Feb 182367.5DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaudenzio Giovanni Antonio Patrignani
Bishop Gaudenzio Giovanni Antonio Patrignani O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016