Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio-Maria Calcagno

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1786BornChioggia
27 May 180922.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 183447.7SelectedBishop of Adria, Italy
19 Dec 183448.1ConfirmedBishop of Adria, Italy
31 May 183548.5Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
8 Jan 184154.1DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio-Maria Calcagno:
Bishop Antonio-Maria Calcagno (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013