Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Angelo Francesco Ramazzotti

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1800Born
4 Apr 182928.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Jun 182928.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 184949.2SelectedBishop of Pavia, Italy
20 May 185049.7ConfirmedBishop of Pavia, Italy
30 Jun 185049.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
15 Mar 185857.6AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
24 Sep 186161.1DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
27 Sep 186161.1Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication

MicroData Summary for Angelo Francesco Ramazzotti (VIAF: 18149143)
Patriarch Angelo Francesco Ramazzotti (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGherla di Crespano del Grappa
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Current)San Francesco Saverio, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439, and Page 584
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 30
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017