Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Giordani

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1822BornSanta Maria Codifiume
19 Sep 184623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ferrara, Italy
6 Mar 187148.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ferrara, Italy
6 Mar 187148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
22 Jun 187754.7AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
14 Mar 188764.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188764.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
21 Apr 189370.5DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giordani:
Cardinal Luigi Giordani (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a cardinal for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 270, and Page 452
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 53
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Mar 1887

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013