Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Vannicelli Casoni

Deceased

Archbishop of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1801Born
18 Dec 182928.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 183938.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Jan 184240.7Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 184240.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
4 Oct 184746.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
20 May 185049.0AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
26 May 185049.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
21 Apr 187776.0DiedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Vannicelli Casoni (VIAF: 89446222)
Luigi Cardinal Vannicelli Casoni (born , died ) Archbishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmelia, Diocese of Terni
Ordained BishopSistine Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Ss. Vincenzo ed Anastasia alle Tre Fontane, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria de' Pini, Lugano, Diocese of Lugano, Switzerland

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270, and Page 52
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 19
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017