Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marcel Touvier, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Olena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1825Born
2 Jun 185529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1 Oct 186943.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia
1 Oct 186943.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
1 May 187044.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
4 Aug 188862.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Abyssinia, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marcel Touvier
Bishop Jean-Marcel Touvier C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Abyssinia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDesnes, Diocese of Saint-Claude, France
Ordained BishopLazaristes in Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018