Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Fegatelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

Titular Bishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1842Born
17 Dec 186422.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188846.2AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
29 Jun 188846.2Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
1 Jun 189149.2AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Dec 190058.7ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Dec 190058.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Scythopolis
23 Jan 190562.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fegatelli
Archbishop Domenico Fegatelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCitta della Pieve, Diocese of CittÓ della Pieve
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ferrara, Archdiocese of Ferrara

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 506
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1888, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017