Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismondo Brandolini Rota

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1823Born
7 Jun 184623.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 187754.1AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
30 Aug 187754.3ResignedBishop-Elect of Chioggia, Italy
28 Feb 187955.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Feb 187955.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
9 Mar 187955.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
27 Mar 188561.9SucceededBishop of Ceneda, Italy
8 Jan 190884.7DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sigismondo Brandolini Rota (VIAF: 88769180)
Bishop Sigismondo Brandolini Rota (born , died ) Bishop of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cassiano del Meschio, Diocese of Ceneda
Ordained BishopTrinite des Monts, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 194, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 428
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017