Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Antivari

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy

Titular Bishop of Eudoxias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1830Born
21 May 185322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
1 Oct 189464.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy
1 Oct 189464.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
25 Nov 189464.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eudoxias
Sep 1899³68.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Udine, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Antivari (VIAF: 241266739)
Bishop Pietro Antonio Antivari (born , died Sep 1899) Auxiliary Bishop of Udine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorsano di Strada, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopCathedral, Udine, Archdiocese of Udine

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017