Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Zoccoli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1828Born
19 Apr 185122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
15 Jan 188657.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
15 Jan 188657.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
31 Jan 188657.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Phrygia
4 Jul 190677.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Zoccoli
Bishop Nicola Zoccoli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfranco Emilia, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Cathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 506
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,886, Number 6
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast