Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Ruggeri (Ruggieri)

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1822Born
18 Dec 184725.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 187451.5AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
24 May 187451.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
3 Jul 188259.7AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
26 Nov 188260.1InstalledBishop of Fano, Italy
23 Mar 189673.4DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Ruggeri (Ruggieri)
Bishop Camillo Ruggeri (Ruggieri) (born , died ) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVergato
Ordained BishopTor de’ Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 157, and Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017