Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Ratta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Titular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1815Born
31 Mar 183823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
15 May 187964.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
15 May 187964.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
1 Jun 187964.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
19 Mar 188570.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Ratta
Bishop Gaetano Ratta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSt. Pierre, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 548
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017