Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Manara

Deceased

Archbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1827Born
25 May 185022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
12 May 187951.4AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
22 May 187951.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
29 Nov 189568.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 189568.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
14 Sep 190476.8AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
15 Feb 190678.2DiedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Achille Manara (VIAF: 304920683)
Achille Cardinal Manara (born , died ) Archbishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAncona, Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana
Buried Place (Original)City, Cemetery, Ancona, Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017