Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Polin

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1825Born
22 Sep 184923.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 187448.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
16 Jan 187448.2AppointedTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia
1 Mar 187448.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Lycia
25 Sep 188256.9AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
18 May 190882.6DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Polin (VIAF: 11238652)
Bishop Antonio Polin (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaerano di San Marco, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopCathedral, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 78, and Page 384
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1874, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017