Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfredo Giovanni Battista Bellati

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1790Born
24 Sep 181424.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 184252.1SelectedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
30 Jan 184352.3ConfirmedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
14 May 184352.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
28 Sep 186979.0DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Manfredo Giovanni Battista Bellati
Bishop Manfredo Giovanni Battista Bellati (born , died ) Bishop of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeltre
Ordained BishopS. Gregorie au Coelius, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1866
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017