Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Clément Bahous

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1799¹BornNazareth
7 Aug 183637.5Ordained BishopBishop of Akka (Melkite Greek), Israel
1 Apr 185657.2SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Apr 185657.2SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Jun 185657.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
16 Jun 185657.4ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Aug 186465.6ResignedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Aug 186465.6ResignedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
13 Jun 188283.4DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Bahous
Patriarch Clément Bahous (born 1799, died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 108
  • c3: CB, 14 Nov 2105
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016