Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Dimitrios I (Joseph) Cadi (Kadi)

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1861BornDamas
1888²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
1895²34.0AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
1898²37.0ResignedPatriarchal Vicar of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine
27 Oct 190342.8AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Nov 190342.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Mar 191958.2SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
29 Mar 191958.2SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Jul 191958.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Jul 191958.5ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
25 Oct 192564.8DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dimitrios I (Joseph) Cadi (Kadi):
Patriarch Dimitrios I (Joseph) Cadi (Kadi) (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 45, and Page 58
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013