Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Kallas

Deceased

Bishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1877BornFakihat
23 Aug 190326.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 192345.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
4 Mar 192345.9SelectedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
23 May 192346.1ConfirmedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
9 Dec 196083.7DiedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kallas:
Bishop Joseph Kallas (born , died ) Bishop of Tripoli del Libano

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015