Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Kallas, S.M.S.P.

Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1931 Born
1957²25.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
13 Aug 195826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
15 Jan 200068.2AppointedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
19 Feb 200068.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
25 May 201078.5RetiredArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Kallas (VIAF: 316004179)
Archbishop Joseph Kallas S.M.S.P. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFakiha

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,738
  • bd/od/c01: CB, 17 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Sep 2017