Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef (Joseph) Absi, S.M.S.P.

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1946 Born
6 May 197326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
13 Jul 199953.0AppointedSuperior General of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
22 Jun 200155.0AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Jun 200155.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
2 Sep 200155.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus dei Greco-Melkiti
13 Oct 200761.3AppointedPatriarchal Vicar of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 201771.0ElectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Jun 201771.0ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
3 Jul 201771.0InstalledPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Youssef (Joseph) Absi (VIAF: 51567816)
Patriarch Youssef (Joseph) Absi S.M.S.P. (born ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Basilica, Harissa, Lebanon

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,037
  • elec: CB, 21 Jun 2017
  • conf: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2017
  • ab/yica: CB, 11 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Sep 2017