Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Al-Debei

Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1970 Born
8 Sep 199827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Dec 201848.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
1 Feb 201948.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria
15 Feb 201948.3InstalledArchbishop of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Elias Al-Debei
Archbishop Elias Al-Debei (born ) Archbishop of Bosra e Haūrān

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamascus, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)
Ordained PriestDamascus, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Damascus, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bosra e Haūrān (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • ob/i/c2+: JPG, 22 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Feb 2019

Quantcast