Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Abou Mokh, B.S. †

Deceased

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1921BornMaaloula
12 Jul 194625.0Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
7 Feb 197856.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
7 Feb 197856.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
17 Mar 197856.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra dei Greco-Melkiti
199775.5AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
27 Jul 199877.1RetiredCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
11 Aug 200685.1DiedCurial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for François Abou Mokh:
Archbishop François Abou Mokh B.S. (born , died ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Vatican Information Service
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013