Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Issam John Darwish (Darwich), B.S.

Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1945 Born
1971²25.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
17 Sep 197227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
9 Apr 199650.9AppointedBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
11 May 199651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
2 Jun 199651.0InstalledBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
25 Jun 201065.1SelectedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
15 Jun 201166.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
14 Aug 201166.2InstalledArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Issam John Darwish (Darwich)
Archbishop Issam John Darwish (Darwich) B.S. (born ) Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamas, Syria

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • i: CB, 9 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,750
  • bp/od: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017