Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edouard Georges Daher, B.C.

Archbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1973 BornQuaa
28 Aug 199421.3Solemn ProfessedMember of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
8 May 199926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
26 Jun 201239.2SelectedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
9 Jul 201340.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
7 Sep 201340.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for Edouard Georges Daher:
Archbishop Edouard Georges Daher B.C. (born ) Archbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2013
  • c34: CB, 7 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,861

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014