Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sleiman Hajjar, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1950BornJezzine
4 Aug 197929.2Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
10 Jul 199848.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
6 Aug 199848.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
10 Mar 200251.8DiedBishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada

MicroData Summary for Sleiman Hajjar:
Bishop Sleiman Hajjar B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal

  • a priest for 22.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,366
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013