Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Saba Youakim, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1914BornWardieh
30 Nov 193925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
9 Sep 196854.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
9 Sep 196854.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
29 Sep 196854.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
15 Oct 197056.3AppointedArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
24 Aug 199278.2RetiredArchbishop of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan
6 Mar 200388.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia (Melkite Greek), Jordan

MicroData Summary for Saba Youakim:
Archbishop Saba Youakim B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Petra e Filadelfia

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015