Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anárghyros Printesis

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece (Greek)

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1937BornVaris
10 Dec 196124.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 197537.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
28 Jun 197537.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
6 Aug 197537.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
23 Apr 200870.6RetiredApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
18 Mar 201274.5DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece (Greek)

MicroData Summary for Anárghyros Printesis:
Bishop Anárghyros Printesis (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Greece

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2008
  • d: CB, 20 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015