Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Ghattas, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1920Born
7 Jul 194625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
2 Dec 198968.9AppointedBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
23 Feb 199069.1Ordained BishopBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
11 Oct 199271.7DiedBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Ghattas
Bishop Ignatius Ghattas B.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNazareth, Israel

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,693
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018