Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Mansour, S.M.S.P. †

Deceased

Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1928BornRas-Baalbek
29 Jun 195223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
19 Aug 198052.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
19 Aug 198052.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
19 Oct 198052.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria dei Greco-Melkiti
199768.4AppointedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Oct 200274.2ResignedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Nov 200678.3DiedCurial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Jean Mansour:
Archbishop Jean Mansour S.M.S.P. (born , died ) Curial Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Jan 2014