Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fares Maakaroun

Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1940 Born
18 Dec 196626.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 199554.7AppointedArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Dec 199555.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
22 Dec 199555.1InstalledArchbishop of Lattaquié {Laodicea} (Melkite Greek), Syria
18 Dec 199959.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
12 Mar 200059.3InstalledBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Jul 201473.6RetiredBishop of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fares Maakaroun
Archbishop Fares Maakaroun (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHauch-Hala-Rayak

Please contact the Archbishop through the Eparchy of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,635
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2014
  • bp/c1/i: CB, 19 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017