Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Riashi, B.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1933Born
28 Aug 195521.7Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
4 Apr 196531.3Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
26 Mar 198753.3AppointedBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
19 Jul 198753.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Michael’s of Sydney (Melkite Greek), Australia
28 Jul 199561.6AppointedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
22 Sep 199561.8InstalledArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
3 Mar 201076.2RetiredArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
28 Oct 201278.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)

MicroData Summary for George Riashi
Archbishop George Riashi B.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaael-Rim

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,259
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • sole/c1/i: CB, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017