Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Youssef Rahal, S.M.S.P.

Archbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1942 BornRas Baalbeck
28 Jun 197028.2Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
28 Jun 200462.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
25 Jul 200462.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Elias Youssef Rahal:
Archbishop Elias Youssef Rahal S.M.S.P. (born ) Archbishop of Baalbek

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archeparchy of Baalbek (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 19 Jan 2014