Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyrille Salim Bustros, S.M.S.P.

Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1939 Born
29 Jun 196223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Società dei Missionari di San Paolo (Melkite Greek)
25 Oct 198849.7AppointedArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
27 Nov 198849.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Jun 200465.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
18 Aug 200465.5InstalledBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
25 Jun 201071.4SelectedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
15 Jun 201172.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Jul 201172.4InstalledArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Cyrille Salim Bustros
Archbishop Cyrille Salim Bustros S.M.S.P. (born ) Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAïn-Bourday

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,019
  • i: CB, 15 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jul 2017