Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias Zoghbi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1912Born
20 Jul 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 195442.6SelectedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
2 Sep 195442.6ConfirmedPatriarchal Vicar of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
2 Sep 195442.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nubia
21 Nov 195442.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nubia
9 Sep 196856.6AppointedArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Oct 198876.7RetiredArchbishop of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
16 Jan 200896.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Baalbek (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Elias Zoghbi (VIAF: 84481641)
Archbishop Elias Zoghbi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Caire

  • a priest for 71.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jul 2017